J. Anthony Seibert
Organization: | American Board of Imaging Informatics |
Individual Appointment Title: | Liaison |
Term: | 1/1/2008--12/31/2014 |
Report Details: |
|
|
Organization: | American Board of Radiology |
Individual Appointment Title: | Physics Trustee - Elected by the ABR |
Term: | 7/1/2013--12/31/2017 |
Report Details: |
|
|
Organization: | American Board of Radiology |
Individual Appointment Title: | Board of Governors |
Term: | 1/1/2019--12/31/2020 |
Report Details: |
|
|
Organization: | European Federation of Organizations for Medical Physics Education & Training |
Individual Appointment Title: | Liaison |
Term: | 1/1/2009--12/31/2009 |
Report Details: |
|
|
Organization: | Radiological Society of North America |
Individual Appointment Title: | Education Council |
Term: | 12/1/2008--11/30/2009 |
Report Details: |
|
|
Back to Member Profile |