Organization: | Society of Chairs of Academic Radiation Oncology Programs (SCAROP) |
Appointee: | M. Saiful Huq |
Appointmee Title: | Liaison |
Term: | 1/1/2022—12/31/2023 |
Report Details: |
|
|
Organization: | Society of Chairs of Academic Radiation Oncology Programs (SCAROP) |
Appointee: | J. Daniel Bourland |
Appointmee Title: | Liaison |
Term: | 1/1/2023—12/31/2023 |
Report Details: |
|
|
Organization: | Society of Chairs of Academic Radiation Oncology Programs (SCAROP) |
Appointee: | Bruce Curran |
Appointmee Title: | Liaison |
Term: | 1/1/2016—12/31/2019 |
Report Details: |
|
|
Organization: | Society of Chairs of Academic Radiation Oncology Programs (SCAROP) |
Appointee: | Bruce Thomadsen |
Appointmee Title: | Liaison |
Term: | 12/31/2019—12/31/2019 |
Report Details: |
|
|
Organization: | Society of Chairs of Academic Radiation Oncology Programs (SCAROP) |
Appointee: | John Bayouth |
Appointmee Title: | Liaison |
Term: | 1/1/2014—12/31/2015 |
Report Details: |
|
|
Back to Invidual Appointments |